NH SB29 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the motorist service signing program.
Title
Relative to the motorist service signing program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/23/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-09-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-09-05 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-08-21 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 4/23/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0218s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0218s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0218s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |