NH SB29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1902e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study incidents of workplace violence against state employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study incidents of workplace violence against state employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1902e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1902e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 211-143 05/02/2019
2019-04-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 9
2019-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-03-26House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-01-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0095s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0095s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0095s, 01/31/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-15SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback