NH SB292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 248; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to implementation of the new mental health 10-year plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to implementation of the new mental health 10-year plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 248; Effective 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 7
2019-05-22HouseExecutive Session: 05/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-14HouseDivision III Work Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Finance 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 6
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1535h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 6
2019-05-02HouseAmendment # 2019-1535h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 6
2019-04-24HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1535h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-10HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-04-10HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0837s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0837s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0837s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-07SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback