NH SB296 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1572h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to live medical testimony in courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to live medical testimony in courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1572h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1572h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019
2019-05-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1572h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 10
2019-04-23HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 71
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0649s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0649s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Morse Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0649s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback