NH SB300 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB300
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating certain ramp tolls on the Everett turnpike in the town of Merrimack.
Title
Eliminating certain ramp tolls on the Everett turnpike in the town of Merrimack.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Rep. Richard Barry [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] |
Rep. Kathryn Stack [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 31 |
2019-11-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 28 |
2019-10-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-10-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-09-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-08-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/04/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1010s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1010s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1010s, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0882s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Chandley Floor Amendment # 2019-0882s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Ought to Pass; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Reconsideration on the vote on Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 8Y-16N, Motion Failed; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 300-FN from the Consent Calendar; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB300 (Carry Over) 2019-11-05 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar)