NH SB304 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.108
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.108
Summary
Relative to the return of outdated drugs.
Title
Relative to the return of outdated drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.108 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 3/3/10; Senate Calendar 8 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate Hearing; January 19, 2010, Room 103, State House, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.4 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2712&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |