NH SB304 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the valuation of property for purposes of agreements for payments in lieu of taxes.
Title
Relative to the valuation of property for purposes of agreements for payments in lieu of taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/13/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/14, Room 103, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |