NH SB309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - II. Remainder Effective 07/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - II. Remainder Effective 07/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating groundwater pollution caused by polluting emissions in the air and relative to standards for perfluorochemicals in drinking water, ambient groundwater, and surface water.
Title
Regulating groundwater pollution caused by polluting emissions in the air and relative to standards for perfluorochemicals in drinking water, ambient groundwater, and surface water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/10/2018 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | I. Section 1 & 2 shall take effect 09/08/2018 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2018; Chapter 0368 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1580h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1580h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1580h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 01:20 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 21 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1310h: Motion Adopted DV 263-71 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 21 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1310h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 19 |
2018-04-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1310h (NT) for 04/12/2018 (Vote 12-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/03/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0973s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0973s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0973s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |