NH SB310 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Doucette): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-139 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to casino gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to casino gambling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 214 N: 139 NV: 17 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - ITL (Y: 289 N: 63 NV: 18 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Remove from Table (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Committee Amendment Sections (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Doucette): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-139 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 289-63 05/08/2019
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/08/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 13
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 11 P. 74
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1202s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment # 2019-1202s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Ought to Pass; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07SenatePending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Reconsider the vote on Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Reconsider the vote on Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-02-13SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=865&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=867&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=40&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=41&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=91&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=92&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=93&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=187&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=188&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0310&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB310&ddlsponsors=&lsr=865

Bill Comments

feedback