NH SB311 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 311-FN Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 311-FN Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of criminal records.
Title
Relative to annulment of criminal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Concur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Concur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 311-FN Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/16/2020; Senate Journal 10 |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/29/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2799h and 2020-0012h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 83 |
2020-01-08 | House | FLAM # 2020-0012h (Reps. Cushing, Welch): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 83 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2799h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 83 |
2019-11-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2799h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 19 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2019-10-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-29 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-15 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/21/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-18 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-10 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0796s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0796s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0796s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB311 (Carry Over) 2019-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate