NH SB312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sen. Chandley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to medical monitoring for exposure to toxic substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to medical monitoring for exposure to toxic substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSen. Chandley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0798s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0798s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-14SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback