NH SB315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB315
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to claims against the state.
Title
Relative to claims against the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB315 (Carry Over) 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study