NH SB319 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB319
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2862s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2862s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring automated external defibrillators in health clubs.
Title
Requiring automated external defibrillators in health clubs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2862s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB319 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2862s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar