NH SB319 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB319
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring automated external defibrillators in certain facilities promoting health and wellness through a paid program of intended physical activity.
Title
Requiring automated external defibrillators in certain facilities promoting health and wellness through a paid program of intended physical activity.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2862s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2862s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2862s, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB319 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2862s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar