NH SB332 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0103; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0103; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medication synchronization.
Title
Relative to medication synchronization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0103; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 3 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 4 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/04/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0418s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0418s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0418s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |