NH SB334 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to temporary licensure of allied health professionals from nearby states, and reciprocal and temporary licensure for occupations and professions for persons from other states.
Title
Relative to temporary licensure of allied health professionals from nearby states, and reciprocal and temporary licensure for occupations and professions for persons from other states.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Rep. Peter Hansen [R] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. Polly Campion [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Concur (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0610s (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0610s (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2018 |
2018-06-26 | Senate | I. Section 3 Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2018; Chapter 0283 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1607h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1607h: Amendment Adopted DV 239-90 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1227h (NT) |
2018-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1607h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 16 |
2018-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/10/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-03-14 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0610s, Regular Calendar 14Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0610s, Regular Calendar 13Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0610s, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0094s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2018-0094s; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0094s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0094s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |