NH SB34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0115; Effective 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0115; Effective 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of a controlled drug analog and prohibiting the sale or possession of synthetic urine and urine additives.
Title
Relative to the definition of a controlled drug analog and prohibiting the sale or possession of synthetic urine and urine additives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - OTP (Y: 240 N: 134 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0115; Effective 09/07/2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 240-134 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 90 |
2021-06-03 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Klein-Knight): Motion Failed DV 135-237 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 90 |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 17 |
2021-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97305033264 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/17/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92274431603 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/20/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |