NH SB346 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring enhanced technology ignition interlock devices.
Title
Relative to requiring enhanced technology ignition interlock devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Dennis Green [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | I. Section 4 Effective 01/01/2022 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0122 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0739s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0739s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0739s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |