NH SB354 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosure of information relative to lower cost drugs under the managed care law.
Title
Relative to disclosure of information relative to lower cost drugs under the managed care law.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Rep. David Luneau [D] |
Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 03:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Luneau, Plumer, Schwaegler 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Withdraws motion to Concur with the House Amendment; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved to Concur with the House Amendment; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1588h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1588h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1588h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 10 P. 52 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |