NH SB356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0109; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0109; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding a representative from the community college system to the apprenticeship advisory council.
Title
Adding a representative from the community college system to the apprenticeship advisory council.
Sponsors
Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0109; Effective 07/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 8 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7 |
2018-03-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 04/04/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |