NH SB366 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0216; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0216; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to membership and procedures of the site evaluation committee.
Title
Relative to membership and procedures of the site evaluation committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0216; Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1551h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1551h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1551h (NT) for 04/26/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 8 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-04-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-03-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-03-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0379s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0379s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0379s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |