NH SB377 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Senate Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 5, Pg.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Senate Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 5, Pg.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to unemployment compensation eligibility for participants in the return to work program.
Title
Relative to unemployment compensation eligibility for participants in the return to work program.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] |
Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Senate Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 5, Pg.130 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Amendment 0655s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 5, Pg.129 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0655s, New Title, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Hearing: 1/24/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |