NH SB377 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transfers from the judicial branch to the executive or legislative branches of state government.
Title
Relative to transfers from the judicial branch to the executive or legislative branches of state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED === |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/6/14; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 103, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |