NH SB38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Signed by the Governor on 09/06/2019; Chapter 0341; Effective 11/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Signed by the Governor on 09/06/2019; Chapter 0341; Effective 11/05/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a bridge in Tamworth in honor of David Bowles.
Title
Naming a bridge in Tamworth in honor of David Bowles.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Susan Ticehurst [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 09/06/2019; Chapter 0341; Effective 11/05/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 11 |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 6 |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 68 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0073s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0073s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0073s, 01/31/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |