NH SB380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0219; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0219; Effective 06/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the therapeutic use of cannabis.
Title
Relative to the therapeutic use of cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. James MacKay [D] |
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Bill Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0219; Effective 06/08/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1268h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1268h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1268h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 22-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0107s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0107s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0107s, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |