NH SB384 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0360; Effective 08/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0360; Effective 08/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to written certification under the use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes law.
Title
Relative to written certification under the use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes law.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0360; Effective 08/31/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5 |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5 |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |