NH SB385 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a full-time circuit court judge in Coos County.
Title
Requiring a full-time circuit court judge in Coos County.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Yvonne Thomas [D] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Alethea Froburg [D] |
Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. John Tholl [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/04/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |