NH SB386 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - III. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - III. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to criminal records.
Title
Relative to access to criminal records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 08/24/2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | II. Section 8 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 38 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | I. Section 36 Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0318 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2088e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2088e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 6 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4 |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 4 |
2018-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |