NH SB39 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2161h (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the repair of roads not maintained by a municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the repair of roads not maintained by a municipality.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2161h (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar)
2019-05-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-04-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-04-24HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0201s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0201s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0201s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback