NH SB393 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to county financial audits, performance audits, and forensic audits.
Title
Relative to county financial audits, performance audits, and forensic audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 01:00 pm, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2018-05-10 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. B. Griffin Replaces Rep. Sterling 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Packard Replaces Rep. J. Belanger 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. F. McCarthy, Sterling, J. Belanger, Treleaven 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gray, Ward, Kahn; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1342h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 9 |
2018-04-19 | House | Amendment # 2018-1342h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 9 |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1342h (NT) for 04/19/2018 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0317s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0317s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0317s, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |