NH SB40 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2019; Chapter 0062; Effective 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2019; Chapter 0062; Effective 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to online driver education.
Title
Relative to online driver education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2019; Chapter 0062; Effective 08/04/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 8 |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 7 |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/31/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |