NH SB407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2018; Chapter 0257; Effective 08/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2018; Chapter 0257; Effective 08/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to membership of the McAuliffe-Shepard discovery center board.
Title
Relative to membership of the McAuliffe-Shepard discovery center board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2018; Chapter 0257; Effective 08/11/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1480h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1480h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1480h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 6 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |