NH SB408 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Licensing historic racing.
Title
Licensing historic racing.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] | Rep. John Graham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202 |
2018-09-05 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2018 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-04-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 17 |
2018-03-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-03-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/05/2018 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 8 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0655s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0655s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0655s, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |