NH SB414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a condominium dispute resolution board.
Title
Establishing a condominium dispute resolution board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |