NH SB414 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to roads within the Woodsville Fire District.
Title
Relative to roads within the Woodsville Fire District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 8 P. 226 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0862s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2020-0862s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0742s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0742s, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |