NH SB418 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2018; Chapter 0284; Effective 06/21/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2018; Chapter 0284; Effective 06/21/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wine samples and samples for consumption on the premises of a beverage manufacturer.
Title
Relative to wine samples and samples for consumption on the premises of a beverage manufacturer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1134s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1134s (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2018; Chapter 0284; Effective 06/21/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2016c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2016c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2016c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Innis, Sanborn, Soucy; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 02:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Williams, Fromuth, Panasiti 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Innis, Bradley, Soucy; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1510h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1510h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1510h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 4 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1091s, and 2018-1134s, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1134s, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1091s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1091s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |