NH SB421 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - III. Remainder shall take effect 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - III. Remainder shall take effect 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for prescription contraceptives.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for prescription contraceptives.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - OTPA (Y: 219 N: 111 NV: 31 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | III. Remainder shall take effect 01/01/2019 |
2018-07-05 | Senate | II. Section 5&7 Effective 01/01/2021 at 12:02 am |
2018-07-05 | Senate | I. Sections 1-3 and 8-10 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 11 |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0361 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2097e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2097e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1753h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-111 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1753h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1753h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 11 |
2018-04-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 22Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |