NH SB421 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to educational assistance for members of the New Hampshire national guard and relative to tuition waivers for children in state foster care or guardianship.
Title
Relative to educational assistance for members of the New Hampshire national guard and relative to tuition waivers for children in state foster care or guardianship.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0441s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0441s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0441s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1 |