NH SB429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0134; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0134; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a consumer services program within the insurance department.
Title
Establishing a consumer services program within the insurance department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0134; Effective 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1819e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1819e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 4 |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 4 |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/04/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0279s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0279s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0279s, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |