NH SB43 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study barriers to increased land development in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study barriers to increased land development in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 119 NV: 45 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2655e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2655e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1520h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-118 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 88
2019-05-08HouseFLAM # 2019-1859h (Rep. Abramson): Amendment Failed DV 119-209 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 88
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1520h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 88
2019-04-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1520h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 17
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-01-31SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-0071s and 2019-0217s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateSen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-0217s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-31SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0071s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0071s, 01/31/2019; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback