NH SB433 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0223; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0223; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the annual filing of statistical reports to the department of education and relative to retention of pupil registers kept on a computer.
Title
Relative to the annual filing of statistical reports to the department of education and relative to retention of pupil registers kept on a computer.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Rep. Mary Gile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0223; Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1321h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1321h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 2 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1321h (NT) for 04/12/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:35 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |