NH SB433 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing October 2020 as eczema awareness month.
Title
Establishing October 2020 as eczema awareness month.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Rep. David Lundgren [R] |
Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Betsy McKinney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 226 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |