NH SB437 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0362; Effective 08/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0362; Effective 08/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the robotics education development program.
Title
Relative to the robotics education development program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0362; Effective 08/31/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2030c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2030c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2030c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 09:15 am, Room 103, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, T. Wolf, M. Moffett, Heath 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Avard, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1564h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1564h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1564h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 5 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0492s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0492s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0492s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |