NH SB449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting tastings by distilleries at farmers markets.
Title
Permitting tastings by distilleries at farmers markets.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. David Milz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/06/2020; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Special Order to 02/06/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/30/2020 Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |