NH SB450 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to brew pubs allowing customers to bring dogs to outdoor areas.
Title
Relative to brew pubs allowing customers to bring dogs to outdoor areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. David Milz [R] | Rep. Patricia Klee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 8 P. 226 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1100s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2020-1100s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2020, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |