NH SB451 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0226; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0226; Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wildlife trafficking.
Title
Relative to wildlife trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 154 N: 155 NV: 47 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - Recommit (Y: 191 N: 154 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - Recommit (Y: 191 N: 154 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0226; Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1961e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1961e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1583h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | FLAM # 2018-1774h (NT) (Rep. Hoell): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 154-155 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1583h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Lay SB 451 on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed DV 149-151 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2018-04-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1583h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 12-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13 |
2018-04-18 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-04-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-04-05 | House | Recommit (Rep. Webb): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-154 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 20 |
2018-03-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-03-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1254h for 04/05/2018 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 9 |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-03-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-0668h: 03/20/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0718s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0718s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0718s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |