NH SB451 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an administrative hearing procedure and penalty for an employer who fails to make payment of wages or who fails to secure workers' compensation coverage.
Title
Establishing an administrative hearing procedure and penalty for an employer who fails to make payment of wages or who fails to secure workers' compensation coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |