NH SB453 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an insurance regulatory sandbox program to temporarily test insurance technology products and services.
Title
Establishing an insurance regulatory sandbox program to temporarily test insurance technology products and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |