NH SB460 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement of zoning violations.
Title
Relative to enforcement of zoning violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. David Milz [R] |
Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 8 P. 226 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/05/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |