NH SB464 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the release of state land for the northern section of the Conway bypass.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the release of state land for the northern section of the Conway bypass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |